$5,000,000.00
|
Chris Larsen
| 09/03/2021 | Chairman of the Board | Ripple Inc | INDIVIDUAL |
$4,000,000.00
|
Kevin Taweel
| 09/03/2021 | CEO | Asurion | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000,000.00
|
Dorothy and Robert King
| 09/07/2021 | Retired | Retired | INDIVIDUAL |
$1,000,000.00
|
Kevin Taweel
| 03/30/2022 | CEO | Asurion | INDIVIDUAL |
$750,000.00
|
Gerald Risk
| 09/03/2021 | Vice Chairman | Asurion | INDIVIDUAL |
$100,000.00
|
Bradley Garlinghouse
| 12/27/2021 | CEO | Ripple | INDIVIDUAL |
$78,000.00
|
William Park
| 04/12/2022 | Real Estate | Self Employed | INDIVIDUAL |
$51,153.00
|
Aggregated Unitemized Contributions
| 03/31/2022 | | | INDIVIDUAL |
$50,000.00
|
Donald R Wilson
| 03/31/2022 | CEO | Drw Trading Group | INDIVIDUAL |
$50,000.00
|
Dv Group LLC
| 03/30/2022 | | | ENTITY |
$50,000.00
|
Richard W Colburn
| 01/12/2022 | Vice President | Payroll & Insurance Inc | INDIVIDUAL |
$50,000.00
|
Robert Oster
| 11/08/2021 | Investor | Robert Oster Company | INDIVIDUAL |
$50,000.00
|
William O'Kane
| 11/04/2021 | Management | Group Fox Management | INDIVIDUAL |
$41,789.77
|
Aggregated Unitemized Contributions
| 12/31/2021 | | | INDIVIDUAL |
$41,423.63
|
Aggregated Unitemized Contributions
| 06/30/2022 | | | INDIVIDUAL |
$39,960.00
|
American Heritage Investment LLC
| 11/16/2021 | | | ENTITY |
$25,879.92
|
Bart Pieper
| 11/01/2021 | Financial Engineer | Marquis Management | INDIVIDUAL |
$25,000.00
|
David Rees-Jones
| 03/17/2022 | Owner | Rees-Jones Oil & Minerals | INDIVIDUAL |
$25,000.00
|
Jay Brown
| 09/07/2021 | President & CEO | Crown Castle | INDIVIDUAL |
$20,370.11
|
Aggregated Unitemized Contributions
| 09/30/2021 | | | INDIVIDUAL |
$15,000.00
|
John Fellowes
| 06/15/2022 | President & CEO | Fellowes Brands | INDIVIDUAL |
$15,000.00
|
John Fellowes
| 06/21/2022 | President & CEO | Fellowes Brands | INDIVIDUAL |
$10,000.00
|
Daniel Adamany
| 05/23/2022 | CEO & Founder | Ahead | INDIVIDUAL |
$10,000.00
|
Dina and Marc Levine
| 06/22/2022 | Investor | Self Employed | INDIVIDUAL |
$10,000.00
|
J Hollinsworth
| 04/28/2022 | Owner | The Hollingsworth Companies | INDIVIDUAL |